Accounts and annual returns INDOOR COMMUNITY SKATE PARK

Charity number: 1162166
Charity reporting is overdue by 1686 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Annual return 20 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 590 days
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 590 days
Annual return 20 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 955 days
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 955 days
Annual return 20 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1320 days
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1320 days
Annual return 20 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1686 days
Accounts and TAR 20 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1686 days