VINCHEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162681
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 November 2016 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)