Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLES MASON AND NAOMI WILKINSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165067
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 April 2022 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 19 April 2022 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 March 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 June 2020 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 June 2020 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 June 2019 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 June 2019 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window