Financial history THE CHARLES MASON AND NAOMI WILKINSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165067
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £81.75k £0 £0 £0 £1.00k
Total expenditure £3.91k £717 £3.22k £1.23k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A