SIMPLEGIFTS: UNITARIAN CENTRE FOR SOCIAL ACTION

Charity number: 1162404
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 03 August 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 03 August 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 27 June 2017 On time Download