BLACKPOOL SMILE

Charity number: 1161675
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We meet every Tuesday morning for lively chat, support, gentle exercise and low impact exercise such as yoga & pilates. These exercises and stretches are specifically tailored for people living with a chronic pain condition and may be carried out seated. Meetings are held at Cherry Tree Community Centre, Cherry Tree Gardens, Marton, Blackpool. FY4 4PY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £1,884
Total expenditure: £2,034

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackpool
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN CHRISTIAN Chair 26 March 2010
None on record
Brenda Mary Roberts Trustee 26 March 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £3.28k £3.18k £6.53k £2.24k £1.88k
Total expenditure £2.54k £3.47k £1.28k £1.61k £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 February 2025 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Fairmont Drive
Hambleton
Poulton-le-Fylde
FY6 9EF
Phone:
01253702343