GOOD THINGS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.26m £5.86m £10.67m £14.39m £17.07m
Total expenditure £6.51m £6.51m £9.76m £12.49m £17.54m
Income from government contracts £208.33k £0 £256.69k £580.76k £1.57m
Income from government grants £5.73m £4.66m £7.21m £5.41m £4.13m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.25m £5.86m £9.87m £14.35m £12.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.26k £11.98k £21.81k £43.42k £20.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £774.48k £0 £4.37m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.51m £6.51m £9.76m £12.49m £17.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.41k £26.23k £226.18k £260.68k £38.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £5.40m £6.45m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0