HAPPY HOURS CLUB

Charity number: 1161030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 October 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required