THE FRIENDS OF ST KATHARINE'S CHURCH ICKLEFORD

Charity number: 1164576
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 March 2021 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 20 March 2021 659 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 20 June 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 February 2018 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required