Accounts and annual returns EASTWELL HISTORY GROUP

Charity number: 1163802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required