NACCOM

Charity number: 1162434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 04 December 2016 On time Download