ST. PETER AND ST.PAUL S' JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OXFORD, ENGLAND UK

Charity number: 1162922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.74k £22.97k £22.14k £18.31k £22.80k
Total expenditure £18.57k £15.65k £21.33k £17.34k £28.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A