ALQUITY TRANSFORMING LIVES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 May 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 23 May 2019 23 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 06 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 06 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required