Accounts and annual returns LIGHTHOUSE ORGANISATION NETWORK
Charity number: 1161916

Charity reporting is overdue by 1738 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 277 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 277 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 642 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 642 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1007 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1007 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1373 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1373 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2017 | 16 September 2020 | 748 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1738 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window