Financial history FRIENDS OF WANSTEAD PARKLANDS

Charity number: 1167459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.75k £2.56k £2.97k £608 £3.44k
Total expenditure £1.92k £1.13k £699 £692 £958
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A