Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY CHARITY PARTNERS

Charity number: 1162570
Charity reporting is overdue by 1499 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 403 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 403 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 768 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 768 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1133 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1133 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1499 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1499 days