NEW EAST PLATFORM

Charity number: 1163752
Charity reporting is overdue by 444 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 01 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 444 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 444 days
Annual return 01 January 2019 15 September 2020 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 15 September 2020 319 days late Download
Annual return 01 January 2018 22 August 2019 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 22 August 2019 294 days late Download
Annual return 01 January 2017 03 April 2019 518 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 03 April 2019 518 days late Download