Accounts and annual returns TRANSPARENT LIFE MINISTRIES (TLM)

Charity number: 1161757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 13 October 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 02 October 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 30 January 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 20 January 2019 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required