Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN

Charity number: 1162261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £125.53k £97.01k £123.01k £91.82k £102.87k
Total expenditure £117.14k £99.99k £154.81k £103.76k £111.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A