CELTIC LEISURE

Charity number: 1161131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW DAVIES Trustee 31 March 2015 None on record
LEIGH ANDREW JOHN DINEEN Trustee 31 March 2015 None on record
PHILOMENA LUCY Fowler Trustee 31 March 2015 None on record
Jemma Locke Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Jeremy Anthony Stephens Trustee 02 July 2015 None on record
Garry Davies Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
HAROLD WORTH Trustee 31 March 2015
ABERAVON SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB Received: On time
Daniel Smith Trustee 27 November 2018 None on record
Hannah Stockham Trustee 21 September 2017 None on record