SOUTH EAST ARTS LONDON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities and facilities for public benefit led by Creative Professionals and Artist Educators. These include public workshops, talks, demonstrations as well as outreach projects. Activities include: ? Outreach programmes: artists in schools and with community groups. ? Resource for the community and encouraging participation. ? Community access to, and use of, facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 20 July 2015: Standard registration
- SEAL (Working name)
- SOUTH EAST ARTS LONDON (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Drewitt | Chair | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frances Felgate | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Olivia Earle | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rasna Khanom | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Guy Haseltine Mr | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Francis | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Brinley Waugh | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £406 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.14k | £519 | £762 | £883 | £2.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 NOV 2013
Charitable objects
PROMOTE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ART AND APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEWISHAM ART HOUSE
140 LEWISHAM WAY
LONDON
SE14 6PD
- Phone:
- 02086919113
- Email:
- info@seartslondon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window