South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an umbrella organisation enabling the 9 churches of the circuit to operate under Methodist Church rules. The Circuit employers Ministers who work in these churches. The Circuit also produces a quarterly preaching plan to ensure regular acts of worship take place at each of the churches in the circuit. These are open to all, without charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£512,424
Donations and legacies | £1.97k | |
Charitable activities | £300.01k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £13.22k | |
Other | £197.23k |
Total expenditure:
£280,653
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £278.90k | |
Other | £1.76k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.76k | |
Charitable expenditure | £278.90k | |
Retained for future use | £231.77k |
People

3 Employee(s)
58 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 26 November 2015: Previously excepted registration
- 14 July 2020: Funds received from 1134233 STRATFORD AND EVESHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
- South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit (Working name)
- SOUTH WEST WORCESTERSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
58 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Mary Harris | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
David Mather | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
SHEILA WEARY | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
SUZANNE ELIZABETH NEVITT | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Jennifer Hicks | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Donald Ian Pritchard | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Henry Lewis | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Pauline Salter | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Anne Vivienne Lewis | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jeffrey Paul Gogarty | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
ANNE DOROTHY MARTIN | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Howitt Barley | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephen David Thomas Froggatt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Deacon Corinne Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Christine Hawkeswood | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Annette Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Carolyn Proctor | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Saunders | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Avesia Vivianne McWhirter | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Karl Andrew Evans | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Grahame Drain | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Drain | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Cynthia Merriman | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD INGLES | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW CHARLES CAPEL | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Anne Yelland | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalyn Ann Kane | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID ARTHUR HASLAM | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
John Winser De Torre | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
DIANE CAPEL | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Peter Gwilliam | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA LANDER | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Glynn HOLLIES | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
VANESSA DAY | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Katherine Jill Pickering | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
JEREMY PAUL CURTIS | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart Watkins | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Nigel John Coke-Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Avril Phillips | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
HOWARD VERNON ASHFORD | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN BRIAN EDWARDS | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID ARTHUR LAWRANCE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MAUREEN DIANE LILIAN DAVIS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MARY AUSTIN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS JOHN STEPHENS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY CHARLES COX | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
TIM HIGGINSON | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
HAZEL MAY LAWRANCE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PETER MICHAEL GRIMWOOD | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN RICHARD MERRIMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN DAVIS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE VERONICA RICH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DIANE MARIE COOKSEY | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
TOM LIBBY | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT LEWIN-JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
CHRISTINE JOAN PARKER | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
PHILIP RIDLEY WETHERALL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
DEACON ANTHONY BRIAN MARTIN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.66k | £325.31k | £347.72k | £343.76k | £512.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.25k | £325.14k | £322.00k | £347.85k | £280.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.97k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.22k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £197.23k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £278.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.76k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.91m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £105 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £453.09k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 01 SEP 2010 as amended on 17 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amphlett House
114 Worcester Road
Droitwich
Worcestershire
WR9 8AW
- Phone:
- 07483 142169
- Email:
- sworcsmethodist@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window