KIDS FITNESS FIRST

Charity number: 1161510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 26 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 21 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 22 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 05 April 2017 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 April 2017 36 days late Download