CHORLEY WANDERERS JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chorley Wanderers Junior Football Club (CWJFC) currently (as at January 2019) supports several boys' football teams ranging from under-7s to under 16s. All teams are managed by qualified coaches and assistants who run the club together with a committee of volunteers in various roles. There are also social activities involving parents and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 April 2016: Standard registration
- CWJFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel McDermott | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN FLUX | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLETTE WHITING | Trustee | 22 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.18k | £35.66k | £46.49k | £53.87k | £54.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.70k | £40.59k | £45.58k | £53.48k | £43.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £1.25k | N/A | £500 | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL. 2) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES). 3) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHETHER OR NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 The Willows
CHORLEY
Lancashire
PR7 3RQ
- Phone:
- 07815 887 818
- Email:
- steve.flux2017@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window