INVISIBLE PALACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in and appreciation and understanding of the arts, culture, heritage, history and sciences for the public benefit. The promotion of equality and diversity and the promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into s
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,370 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aoife Louise Dawe | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary O'Connor | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ruth Lines | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ayesha Begum | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Patterson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £27.48k | £61.37k | £68.98k | £48.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.77k | £25.09k | £28.98k | £50.66k | £65.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £5.16k | £39.20k | £3.99k | £6.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE, HISTORY AND SCIENCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). THESE OBJECTS WILL BE CARRIED OUT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: - BY OFFERING A PROGRAMME OF ARTS, CULTURAL, HERITAGE AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS, WORKING WITH THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO LIVE, WORK OR STUDY IN THE AREA WHATEVER THEIR BACKGROUND, AND FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC, WITH THE AIM OF ENABLING PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS TO INTERACT WITH EACH OTHER; - IN THE NEIGHBOURHOODS OF ANERLEY, PENGE, NORWOOD, SYDENHAM AND THORNTON HEATH; AND FROM TIME TO TIME IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 DULWICH WOOD AVENUE
LONDON
SE19 1HB
- Phone:
- 07722814672
- Email:
- info@invisiblepalace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window