HAMARA HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE

Charity number: 1162962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £807.73k £958.79k £1.04m £885.42k £876.95k
Total expenditure £875.32k £1.01m £1.12m £922.56k £800.03k
Income from government contracts £280.54k £319.35k £194.63k £150.99k £151.24k
Income from government grants £2.61k £2.94k £194.63k £199.43k £287.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £522.42k £665.57k £744.99k £673.78k £674.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £285.31k £290.91k £298.97k £211.64k £202.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £2.31k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £875.32k £1.01m £1.12m £922.56k £800.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £48.44k £41.08k £36.25k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0