FULL CIRCLE FUND THERAPIES

Charity number: 1162010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £71.84k £132.08k £51.67k £66.61k £99.16k
Total expenditure £42.50k £79.03k £93.10k £66.06k £78.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A