LAKESIDE C.A.

Charity number: 506125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN WRIGHT Chair 20 October 2016
THE SUNDERLAND CARDIAC SUPPORT GROUP Received: On time
John Robert Anthony Kinnair Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Councillor Darryl Dixon Cllr Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Yvonne Smith Trustee 28 November 2020 None on record
Robert Ambrose Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
Robert Watson Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Councillor Stuart Porthouse Trustee 05 July 2017
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND INSTITUTE OF MINING AND MECHANICAL ENGINEERS Received: On time
HETTON COLLIERY RAILWAY 200 Received: On time
Audrey Henderson Trustee 10 October 2016 None on record
Julie Mulvaney Ms Trustee 28 November 2020 None on record
Dean Gray Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record