Financial history HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1162116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £98.78k £159.62k £44.79k £35.60k £43.11k
Total expenditure £75.48k £108.17k £111.44k £24.36k £35.17k
Income from government contracts £49.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £85.36k £8.00k N/A N/A