THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST LAURENCE

Charity number: 1165174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Herbie Sykes Trustee 28 October 2021 None on record
Lee Smith Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
Mr C Jones Trustee 10 September 2017
CHARITY OF HUMPHREY CHILTON HOWARD FRANCIS Received: On time
Chris Holmes Trustee 04 July 2021 None on record
Calum Macleod Trustee 04 July 2021 None on record
DR Naomi Brown Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record