BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY SOLUTIONS

Charity number: 1162568
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 November 2020 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 November 2020 213 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 November 2020 574 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 November 2020 579 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 August 2019 457 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 29 November 2020 913 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 July 2017 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 24 July 2017 54 days late Download