BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY SOLUTIONS

Charity number: 1162568
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £9.54k £0 £0 £0 £9.50k
Total expenditure £1.16k £0 £0 £0 £9.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A