THE HIDDEN HOMELESS LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hidden Voices are champions of positive change in the lives of vulnerable people. We provide training and activities to improve mental health, raise self-esteem and build confidence. We aim to give all our clients the power to regain control of their lives. Our main activities are: Life Coaching Change Starting Point Living Well
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Leeds City
Governance
- 06 May 2016: Standard registration
- 15 March 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- HIDDEN VOICES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.06k | £286.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.14k | £179.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 APR 2016
Charitable objects
***** IN ADMINISTRATION ***** THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS, AT RISK OF BECOMING HOMELESS, VULNERABLE OR IN SOME WAY DISADVANTAGED BY THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND TRAINING AIMED AT INCREASING THE CAPACITY, SKILLS, PERSONAL CONFIDENCE AND SELF-ESTEEM OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH SERVICES, IN ORDER THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window