ARTICLE 39

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Article 39 fights for the rights of children living in institutional settings in England. Our name comes from the part of the United Nations Convention on the Rights of the Child which entitles children who have suffered rights violations to recover in environments where their health, self-respect and dignity are nurtured.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,180 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSANNAH MARY WALKER BSocSci | Chair | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Clare Savic | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Venetia PA Mayman | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Emily Parker | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Littlechild | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES STEIN PROFESSOR | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynton James Roy Orrett | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.65k | £173.79k | £180.39k | £220.28k | £238.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.73k | £131.92k | £154.16k | £212.67k | £210.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £4.75k | N/A | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF NEED, AND PROMOTION OF THE PROTECTION, OF CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS IN ENGLAND THROUGH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (A) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION TO CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS ABOUT LAW, POLICY AND PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS IN RESPECT OF THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT, AND THE WAYS IN WHICH THEY CAN RAISE CONCERNS AND CHALLENGE MISTREATMENT; (B) UNDERTAKING AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH ON SAFEGUARDING AND CHILD PROTECTION MATTERS IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (C) MONITORING CHILD PROTECTION CONCERNS AND PRACTICES IN CHILDREN’S INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (D) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON MATTERS RELATED TO THE SAFETY AND WELL-BEING OF CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (E) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED LEGISLATION CONCERNED WITH THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS IN ENGLAND BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE MEANS BY WHICH CHILDREN MAY SEEK REDRESS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES; (B) MONITORING HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES IN CHILDREN’S INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (C) UNDERTAKING AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS IN CHILDREN’S INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (D) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (E) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED LEGISLATION CONCERNED WITH THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN LIVING IN INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (F) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES IN CHILDREN’S INSTITUTIONAL SETTINGS; (G) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (H) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (I) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS. (3) WHERE ANY HUMAN RIGHT IS TO BE ADVANCED BY MEANS OF LITIGATION, THIS WILL BE LIMITED TO ESTABLISHING THE PRIMACY OF RELEVANT LAWS WHICH EITHER FORM PART OF THE DOMESTIC LAW OF THE STATE CONCERNED (INCLUDING FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT LEGAL PROCEEDINGS BEFORE ANY CONSTITUTIONAL COURT) OR ARE BINDING ON THAT LAW AND WHERE THE STATE CONCERNED HAS IMPLEMENTED THE RELEVANT TREATY OBLIGATIONS SO AS TO PROVIDE A COMPETENT DOMESTIC CONSTITUTIONAL COURT EMPOWERED TO DETERMINE THIS OR WHERE THERE IS AN INTERNATIONAL TRIBUNAL, THE LEGITIMACY OF WHICH HAS BEEN RECOGNISED BY THE STATE CONCERNED AND WHOSE DECISIONS AS A MATTER OF DOMESTIC LAW BIND THE DOMESTIC LAW OF THE STATE CONCERNED. (4) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS. (5) FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE: “CHILDREN” MEANS ANY HUMAN BEING FROM BIRTH TO 18 YEARS. “INSTITUTIONAL SETTING” MEANS AN ESTABLISHMENT THAT IS NOT A FAMILY HOME AND IN WHICH A CHILD HAS BEEN PLACED, OR IS BEING HELD, BY THEIR PARENTS OR THE AUTHORITIES FOR THE PURPOSES OF CARE, PROTECTION, EDUCATION, MEDICAL TREATMENT, TRAINING, DETENTION OR PUNISHMENT. THIS DOES NOT INCLUDE KINSHIP CARE, FOSTERING, ADOPTION OR ANY ARRANGEMENT IN WHICH A CHILD IS LIVING WITH A FAMILY MEMBER. “HUMAN RIGHTS” MEANS THE UNITED NATIONS (UN) UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, THE UN CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND OTHER RELEVANT UN CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS, AND OTHER RELEVANT INTERNATIONAL AND REGIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS INSTRUMENTS AND DOMESTIC LEGISLATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CRANMER STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 4GH
- Phone:
- 07531837260
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window