Accounts and annual returns KP24 FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161925
Charity reporting is overdue by 1584 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 853 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 853 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1219 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1219 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1584 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1584 days