THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, STEVENAGE

Charity number: 1161229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100.79k £108.42k £170.06k £641.41k £558.83k
Total expenditure £110.20k £103.85k £174.14k £616.09k £571.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £201.51k £125.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £52.37k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £13 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £439.88k £380.97k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £571.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £750
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £616.09k £0