THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, STEVENAGE

Charity number: 1161229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN BAILEY Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
Karen Ann Walker Trustee 28 April 2019
HAWKES WILL TRUST Received: On time
Mark Parker Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
JASON ANDREW COX Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Mathew Isaac Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
CATHERINE ANN BIBBY Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER MARTYN TAPLIN Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Irina Teoh Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
Michael Alan Wilton Trustee 22 April 2018
HAWKES WILL TRUST Received: On time
ALISON HARE Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
STUART JOSEPH MARSHALL Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
EDWARD KAAHWA Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Rev DAVID MARK BROWN Chair 26 April 2015
HAWKES WILL TRUST Received: On time
BURY MEAD Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS STEVENAGE Overdue by 34 days
CHRISTINE CHAMBERS Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record