THE SIR ROGER MANWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 1162107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 12 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 05 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 12 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 12 October 2016 On time Download