ACTION BLADDER CANCER UK

Charity number: 1164374
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 October 2017 On time Download