Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS LTD

Charity number: 1163027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 01 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window