MICROPHTHALMIA, ANOPHTHALMIA & COLOBOMA SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MACS is the UK's only charity specifically supporting children and adults born with Microphthalmia (small underdeveloped eyes), Anophthalmia (no eyes) or Coloboma (cleft of the eye). MACS enables people affected by these rare conditions to connect with each other and provides access to emotional and practical support, grants, and regional activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2015: CIO registration
- 09 May 2017: Funds received from 1040074 MICRO AND ANOPHTHALMIC CHILDRENS SOCIETY
- MACS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Hiley | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jefferies | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rory Hallas | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ANNE GORDON | Trustee | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GARY ROBERT MURPHY | Trustee | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £528.40k | £351.14k | £381.17k | £275.88k | £345.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £572.60k | £402.29k | £356.93k | £397.92k | £352.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.73k | £7.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £499.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £150 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £430.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £142.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 29 MAY 2015 AMENDED ON 03 AUG 2016 as amended on 27 May 2019 as amended on 20 Sep 2022 as amended on 20 Sep 2022 as amended on 20 Sep 2022 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The provision of support to people with Microphthalmia, Anophthalmia and/or Coloboma conditions and their families; And 2) The advancement of education of the public concerning Microphthalmia, Anophthalmia and/or Coloboma conditions.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MACS Charity
71-75 Shelton Street
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 08001698088
- Email:
- enquiries@macs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window