Trustees WREXHAM FOODBANK / BANC BWYD WRECSAM

Charity number: 1162262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR CAMPBELL EDMONDSON Chair 10 June 2015
None on record
Margaret Joy Monahan Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
Suzanne Nantcurvis Trustee 09 April 2019
None on record
Gerard Doyle Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
ROBERT OPPER Trustee 15 July 2015
None on record