Financial history THE SOUSTER YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1162368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £90.09k £146.96k £145.13k £183.53k £169.95k
Total expenditure £71.91k £120.25k £137.67k £139.75k £131.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £12.47k £3.36k