CROWLAND COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of education for the public in Crowland and surrounding areas by the provision of library services. 2. To further or benefit the residents of Crowland and the surrounding areas by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations to advance education and provide facilities for social welfare,recreation and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,167 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BYWATER | Chair | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Annette Turner | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Simmons | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Richard Sparkes | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Donald Gordon | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.15k | £30.39k | £18.75k | £23.33k | £25.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.37k | £36.00k | £11.94k | £22.86k | £20.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.17k | £5.17k | N/A | £5.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN CROWLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF LIBRARY SERVICES. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CROWLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crowland Community Hub
Crowland Library
Hall Street
Crowland
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 0EW
- Phone:
- 01733211522
- Email:
- CrowlandHub@outlook.com
- Website:
-
crowlandhub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window