Trustees RESEARCH DATA ALLIANCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Jane Hanahoe Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Mark Anthony Leggott Trustee 26 April 2019
None on record
Jillian Elizabeth Benn Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Dr Robert James Hanisch Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
DR Ingrid Gracia Dillo Trustee 05 April 2018
None on record
Professor Claudia Maria Bauzer Medeiros Trustee 05 April 2018
None on record
Dr Jason Haga Trustee 05 April 2018
None on record
Dr Sandra Collina Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Edit Herczog Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record