FOUNDERS FOR GOOD LTD

Charity number: 1162201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.69m £3.90m £1.75m £13.00m £19.76m
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.32m £1.51m £7.29m £9.84m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.35m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.67m £3.87m £1.73m £13.00m £19.29m
Income - Other trading activities £10.03k £27.00k £16.50k £0 £469.98k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.87k £1.17k £3.31k £856 £3.37k
Income - Other £0 £345 £40 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.27m £1.42m £7.15m £9.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.51k £51.32k £86.00k £141.27k £41.84k
Expenditure - Governance £4.29k £0 £0 £22.70k £3.42m
Expenditure - Grants institution £743.49k £0 £517.80k £3.82m £6.24m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0