ROYSTON BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the inhabitants of Royston by the provision of facilities for playing bowls together with the promotion of a clubhouse and bowling green.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JOHN PIGG | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
STEWART JEFFREY BROWN | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WOOR | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.50k | £22.81k | £44.06k | £39.17k | £44.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.30k | £20.77k | £31.99k | £44.73k | £37.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £10.00k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 APR 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF ROYSTON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS TOGETHER WITH THE PROVISION OF A CLUBHOUSE AND BOWLING GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Melbourn Road
ROYSTON
SG8 7DB
- Phone:
- 07733476235
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window