Accounts and annual returns 360 GIVING

Charity number: 1164883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window