360 GIVING

Charity number: 1164883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Stroyan Kerr Trustee 15 July 2021 None on record
Shun Yu Bonnie Chiu Trustee 15 July 2021
LHA LONDON LTD Received: On time
Dr Danil Mikhailov Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Thrisa Haldar Trustee 15 July 2021
HAIDAKHANDI SAMAJ (UK) Received: On time
FRANCESCA ELIZABETH SAINSBURY PERRIN Chair 16 July 2015 None on record
Farah Yasmine Zohra Ahmed Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Jonathan Timothy Charles Cracknell Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Manny Hothi Trustee 22 November 2019 None on record
Geoffrey Ian Chapman Trustee 29 November 2016 None on record