Accounts and annual returns EDAID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163047
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 December 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 December 2020 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 November 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 November 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required